PA SB351 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 351 PN 341, FP (Y: 180 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: SB 351 PN 341, 2019 A5784, SCHWEYER (Y: 95 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 351 PN 341, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 351 PN 341, A3153, AMENDMENT NO. A-3153 (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 351 PN 341, FP (Y: 180 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: SB 351 PN 341, 2019 A5784, SCHWEYER (Y: 95 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 351 PN 341, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 351 PN 341, A3153, AMENDMENT NO. A-3153 (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Act No. 51 |
2020-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | Signed in House |
2020-06-23 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (180-21) |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-19 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-19 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-10-28 | House | In the House |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |