PA SB368 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
Pending: House Children & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
Pending: House Children & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for notification to department and development of plan of safe care for children under one year of age.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for notification to department and development of plan of safe care for children under one year of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 368 PN 1383, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |
2020-04-29 | House | In the House |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |