PA SB372 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 37 (Historical and Museums) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in powers and duties of Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission, further providing for specific powers and duties, for personal property and for documents and providing for Commonwealth archival records, for local government archival records and for access to older public records; and, in historic properties, further providing for title to historic property and for powers over certain historic property.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in powers and duties of Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission, further providing for specific powers and duties, for personal property and for documents and providing for Commonwealth archival records, for local government archival records and for access to older public records; and, in historic properties, further providing for title to historic property and for powers over certain historic property.
Sponsors
Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 372 PN 453, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-08 | House | In the House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |