PA SB395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on November 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-03 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on November 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-03 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1970 (P.L.128, No.49), entitled "An act granting to the Governor of the Commonwealth the sole authority for regulating the display of the flag of the United States from any public ground or building and from any ground or building of certain other institutions," further providing for display of flag.
Title
Amending the act of March 4, 1970 (P.L.128, No.49), entitled "An act granting to the Governor of the Commonwealth the sole authority for regulating the display of the flag of the United States from any public ground or building and from any ground or building of certain other institutions," further providing for display of flag.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A07778 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 395 PN 2111, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 395 PN 2111, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 395 PN 1824, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 395 PN 2111, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 395 PN 2111, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 395 PN 1824, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 109 |
2020-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-10-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-10-21 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2020-10-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | House | Second consideration |
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-30 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-09-23 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-09-22 | House | In the House |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |