PA SB398 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review, for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review and for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review, for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review and for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 380, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 380, A3184, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3184 (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 380, A3182, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3182 (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 380, A3216, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3216 (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 380, A3184, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3184 (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 380, A3182, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3182 (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 380, A3216, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3216 (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-10-22 | House | In the House |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (27-22) |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-09-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |