PA SB399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1471, No.165), known as the Sexual Assault Testing and Evidence Collection Act, further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program, for rights of sexual assault victims and for report by Pennsylvania State Police.
Title
Further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program, for rights of sexual assault victims and for report by Pennsylvania State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 399 PN 947, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: SB 399 PN 947, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 8 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01702 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 399 PN 586, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 399 PN 947, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: SB 399 PN 947, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 8 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01702 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 399 PN 586, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 29 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-04-10 | House | In the House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |