PA SB412 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, repealing provisions relating to disqualifications for service as election officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, repealing provisions relating to disqualifications for service as election officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 412 PN 730, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14HouseRemoved from table
2020-07-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-18HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-18HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-07HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-06HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-06HouseFirst consideration
2020-04-06HouseReported as committed
2019-10-25HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-10-22HouseIn the House
2019-10-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-2)
2019-10-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-03SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-03SenateSecond consideration
2019-05-07SenateFirst consideration
2019-05-07SenateReported as amended
2019-03-19SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=412
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0412&pn=0431
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0412&pn=0730
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=05/07/2019&RollCallId=171
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/21/2019&RollCallId=524
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=283
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/06/2020&RollCallId=1749

Bill Comments

feedback