PA SB414 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for applications for official absentee ballots, for absentee electors files and lists, for delivering or mailing ballots, for voting by absentee electors and for canvassing of official absentee ballots.
Title
In voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for applications for official absentee ballots, for absentee electors files and lists, for delivering or mailing ballots, for voting by absentee electors and for canvassing of official absentee ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |