PA SB417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in party organization, further providing for who shall be declared elected members of national or State committee and party offices; and, in returns of primaries and elections, further providing for manner of computing irregular ballots.
Title
In party organization, further providing for who shall be declared elected members of national or State committee and party offices; and, in returns of primaries and elections, further providing for manner of computing irregular ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 417 PN 1652, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-04-21 | House | In the House |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (35-15) |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |