PA SB425 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in crime victims, further providing for rights.
Title
In crime victims, further providing for rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 425 PN 392, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-04-09 | House | In the House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |