PA SB43 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Act No. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Act No. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of U.S. Route 30 in Hempfield Township, Southwest Greensburg Borough, the City of Greensburg, and South Greensburg Borough, Westmoreland County, as the J. Edward "Hutch" Hutchinson Memorial Bypass.
Title
Designating a portion of U.S. Route 30 in Hempfield Township, Southwest Greensburg Borough, the City of Greensburg, and South Greensburg Borough, Westmoreland County, as the J. Edward "Hutch" Hutchinson Memorial Bypass.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: SB 43 PN 20, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 43 PN 20, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: SB 43 PN 20, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 43 PN 20, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Act No. 11 |
2019-06-21 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-11 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-10 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-19 | House | In the House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |