PA SB432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 27, 2014 (P.L.2911, No.191), known as the Achieving Better Care by Monitoring All Prescriptions Program (ABC-MAP) Act, further providing for access to prescription information.
Title
Further providing for access to prescription information.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Sen. Mario Scavello [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 432 PN 1490, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: SB 432 PN 1490, CONCUR (Y: 125 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: SB 432 PN 1432, FP (Y: 119 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: SB 432 PN 401, 2019 A4109, GROVE (Y: 113 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 432 PN 401, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 432 PN 1490, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: SB 432 PN 1490, CONCUR (Y: 125 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: SB 432 PN 1432, FP (Y: 119 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: SB 432 PN 401, 2019 A4109, GROVE (Y: 113 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 432 PN 401, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Act No. 8 |
2020-02-12 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-02-06 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-02-05 | House | Signed in House |
2020-02-05 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (125-67) |
2020-02-04 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-02-04 | House | In the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (41-9) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-12-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (119-77) |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-20 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2019-06-18 | House | In the House |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |