PA SB439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Re-referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Re-referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 28, 1935 (P.L.477, No.193), referred to as the Enforcement Officer Disability Benefits Law, further providing for disability benefits and for definitions.
Title
Further providing for disability benefits and for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 439 PN 427, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 439 PN 427, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Re-referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-09-25 | House | In the House |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |