PA SB441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge carrying State Route 2087 over the East Branch Codorus Creek in York County as the Sgt. Christopher M. Wrinkle and Tosca Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge carrying State Route 2087 over the East Branch Codorus Creek in York County as the Sgt. Christopher M. Wrinkle and Tosca Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: SB 441 PN 439, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 441 PN 439, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: SB 441 PN 439, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 441 PN 439, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Act No. 8 |
2019-06-12 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-04 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-03 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-03 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-05-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-13 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-13 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-04-10 | House | In the House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |