PA SB456 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 15, 1986 (P.L.1585, No.174), known as the Private Licensed Schools Act, further providing for definitions, for State Board of Private Licensed Schools, for powers and duties of board, for application for license, for license fees and for requirements for licensure and operation; providing for multibranch training schools and for institutional grants authority; further providing for promulgation of rules; and repealing provisions relating to existing licenses to remain in force and transfer of personnel, etc.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for State Board of Private Licensed Schools, for powers and duties of board, for application for license, for license fees and for requirements for licensure and operation; providing for multibranch training schools and for institutional grants authority; further providing for promulgation of rules; and repealing provisions relating to existing licenses to remain in force and transfer of personnel, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] |
Sen. Michael Regan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 456 PN 1266, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: SB 456 PN 1266, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03223 (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 456 PN 1056, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 456 PN 1266, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: SB 456 PN 1266, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03223 (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 456 PN 1056, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | Senate | Act No. 110 |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-10-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2019-10-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-29 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-29 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-23 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-06-25 | House | In the House |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |