PA SB463 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for the definition of "building machinery and equipment."
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for the definition of "building machinery and equipment."
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |