PA SB48 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Veto No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), know as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in ballots, further providing for form of official election ballot and for number of ballots to be printed and specimen ballots; in voting machines, further providing for requirements of voting machines and for form of ballot labels on voting machines; in electronic voting systems, further providing for requirements of electronic voting systems, for forms and for election day procedures and the process of voting; providing for voting systems and for voting systems bonds; establishing the County Voting System Reimbursement Account; in preparation for and conduct of primaries and elections, further providing for instructions of voters and manner of voting in districts in which voting machines are used, for count and return of votes in districts in which ballots are used and for what ballots shall be counted, manner of counting and defective ballots; and, in voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for date of application for absentee ballot, for approval of application for absentee ballot, for voting by absentee electors, for canvassing of official absentee ballots and for public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In ballots, further providing for form of official election ballot and for number of ballots to be printed and specimen ballots; in voting machines, further providing for requirements of voting machines and for form of ballot labels on voting machines; in electronic voting systems, further providing for requirements of electronic voting systems, for forms and for election day procedures and the process of voting; providing for voting systems and for voting systems bonds; establishing the County Voting System Reimbursement Account; in preparation for and conduct of primaries and elections, further providing for instructions of voters and manner of voting in districts in which voting machines are used, for count and return of votes in districts in which ballots are used and for what ballots shall be counted, manner of counting and defective ballots; and, in voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for date of application for absentee ballot, for approval of application for absentee ballot, for voting by absentee electors, for canvassing of official absentee ballots and for public records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 48 PN 1080, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 48 PN 1080, FP (Y: 111 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02597 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 48 PN 1037, 2019 A2493, EVERETT (Y: 108 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 48 PN 1037, 2019 A2490, EVERETT (Y: 109 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02249 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02244 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02145 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 48 PN 584, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 48 PN 584, A952, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-0952 (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-05SenateVeto No. 3
2019-07-05SenateVetoed by the Governor
2019-06-27SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-27SenateSigned in House
2019-06-27SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-27SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (31-19)
2019-06-27SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-06-27SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2019-06-27SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (111-88)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported as amended
2019-06-26HouseAmended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-25HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-25HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-20HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-20HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-20HouseReported as amended
2019-05-01HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-04-30HouseIn the House
2019-04-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (27-21)
2019-04-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-04-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-10SenateSecond consideration
2019-04-09SenateFirst consideration
2019-04-09SenateReported as amended
2019-01-11SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=48
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0048&pn=0024
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0048&pn=0584
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0048&pn=1037
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0048&pn=1076
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0048&pn=1080
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=04/09/2019&RollCallId=97
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=105
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=51
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=52
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=855
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=856
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=857
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=891
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=564
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=565
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=963
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=962
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=614
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=251
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=480

Bill Comments

feedback