PA SB487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 2005 (P.L.474, No.94), known as the Breach of Personal Information Notification Act, further providing for title of act, for definitions and for notification of breach; prohibiting employees of the Commonwealth from using nonsecured Internet connections; and providing for Commonwealth policy and for entities subject to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996.
Title
Further providing for title of act, for definitions and for notification of breach; prohibiting employees of the Commonwealth from using nonsecured Internet connections; and providing for Commonwealth policy and for entities subject to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 487 PN 516, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 487 PN 516, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-09-22 | House | In the House |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |