PA SB491 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1990 (P.L.404, No.98), known as the Real Estate Appraisers Certification Act, further providing for definitions and for State Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for State Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 491 PN 558, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 491 PN 558, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-08 | House | Second consideration |
2020-07-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-27 | House | In the House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |