PA SB492 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 16, 1992 (P.L.155, No.28), known as the Assessors Certification Act, further providing for definitions and for duties of board; repealing provisions relating to qualifications; further providing for certification; providing for employees of political subdivisions; further providing for disciplinary and correction measures and for unlawful practice; repealing provisions relating to nonapplicability; and providing for assessors in counties of the first class.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for duties of board; repealing provisions relating to qualifications; further providing for certification; providing for employees of political subdivisions; further providing for disciplinary and correction measures and for unlawful practice; repealing provisions relating to nonapplicability; and providing for assessors in counties of the first class.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 492 PN 1467, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-28 | House | In the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |