PA SB5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review and for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review; and providing for concurrent resolution required for economically significant regulations.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review and for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review; and providing for concurrent resolution required for economically significant regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-05-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |