PA SB502 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in crime victims, further providing for rights, for responsibilities of victims of crime under basic bill of rights, for responsibilities of State and local law enforcement agencies and for responsibilities of prosecutor's office; in administration, further providing for office, for powers and duties of victim advocate and for powers and duties of Office of Victims' Services; in parole advocacy, further providing for preparole notification to victim and for petitions to deny parole upon expiration of minimum sentence; in compensation, further providing for persons eligible for compensation, for filing of claims for compensation, for minimum allowable claim, for determination of claims, for emergency awards, for awards and for confidentiality of records; in services, further providing for eligibility of victims; in financial matters, further providing for costs and for costs for offender supervision programs; and, in enforcement, further providing for subrogation.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in crime victims, further providing for rights, for responsibilities of victims of crime under basic bill of rights, for responsibilities of State and local law enforcement agencies and for responsibilities of prosecutor's office; in administration, further providing for office, for powers and duties of victim advocate and for powers and duties of Office of Victims' Services; in parole advocacy, further providing for preparole notification to victim and for petitions to deny parole upon expiration of minimum sentence; in compensation, further providing for persons eligible for compensation, for filing of claims for compensation, for minimum allowable claim, for determination of claims, for emergency awards, for awards and for confidentiality of records; in services, further providing for eligibility of victims; in financial matters, further providing for costs and for costs for offender supervision programs; and, in enforcement, further providing for subrogation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03695 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03695 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 502 PN 693, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03695 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03695 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 502 PN 693, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-12 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-24 | House | Removed from table |
2020-03-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-09 | House | First consideration |
2019-12-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-06-05 | House | In the House |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |