PA SB508 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating U.S. Route 62 in Mercer County as the Mercer County Veterans Highway.
Title
Designating U.S. Route 62 in Mercer County as the Mercer County Veterans Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - SB 508 PN 508, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-04-07 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2011-04-05 | House | In the House |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-03-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-02-11 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |