PA SB530 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-03 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-03 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, providing for students convicted or adjudicated delinquent of sexual assault; in safe schools, further providing for safe schools advocate in school districts of the first class; and, in educational tax credits, further providing for school
Title
In pupils and attendance, providing for students convicted or adjudicated delinquent of sexual assault; in safe schools, further providing for safe schools advocate in school districts of the first class; and, in educational tax credits, further providing for school
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 530 PN 1940, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 530 PN 1940, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 530 PN 1940, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 530 PN 1940, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-03 | House | Act No. 110 |
2020-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-26 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-10-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | House | Second consideration |
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-10-01 | House | First consideration |
2020-10-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-09-14 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2020-09-09 | House | In the House |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |