PA SB536 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, establishing the Public Higher Education Funding Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Public Higher Education Funding Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 536 PN 859, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2019-06-17HouseIn the House
2019-06-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-10SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-05SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-05SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-04SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-04SenateReported as amended
2019-04-10SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=536
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0536&pn=0599
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0536&pn=0859
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=213
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=249
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=128

Bill Comments

feedback