PA SB546 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on November 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-20 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on November 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-20 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge carrying State Route 88 over the Ten Mile Creek connecting Jefferson Township, Greene County, and East Bethlehem Township, Washington County, as the Lieutenant General William M. Keys Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge carrying State Route 88 over the Ten Mile Creek connecting Jefferson Township, Greene County, and East Bethlehem Township, Washington County, as the Lieutenant General William M. Keys Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-12 - House - SB 546 PN 510, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - SB 546 PN 510, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - SB 546 PN 510, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-20 | House | Act No. 87 |
2013-11-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2013-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2013-11-13 | House | Signed in House |
2013-11-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2013-11-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2013-11-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-23 | House | Second consideration |
2013-10-22 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-16 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2013-06-19 | House | In the House |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |