PA SB547 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, further providing for permit and license application requirements and for enforcement orders; and providing for repeat violations.
Title
Further providing for permit and license application requirements and for enforcement orders; and providing for repeat violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |