PA SB570 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1987 (P.L.246, No.47), known as the Municipalities Financial Recovery Act, providing for recovery grants for distressed municipalities.
Title
Providing for recovery grants for distressed municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |