PA SB572 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, further providing for the Pennsylvania State Police; and repealing an act relating to limitation on complement of the Pennsylvania State police.
Title
Further providing for the Pennsylvania State Police; and repealing an act relating to limitation on complement of the Pennsylvania State police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-23 - Senate - SB 572 PN 583, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-25 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2009-06-23 | In the House | |
2009-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-17 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-08 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-16 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-11 | First consideration | |
2009-03-11 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |