PA SB575 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in environmental stewardship and watershed protection, further providing for agencies; providing for Pennsylvania Clean Water Procurement Program; establishing the Watershed Innovation and Improvement Fund; and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In environmental stewardship and watershed protection, further providing for agencies; providing for Pennsylvania Clean Water Procurement Program; establishing the Watershed Innovation and Improvement Fund; and making an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 575 PN 930, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-06-26HouseIn the House
2019-06-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (33-17)
2019-06-10SenateRe-reported as amended
2019-06-05SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-05SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-04SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-04SenateReported as amended
2019-05-31SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=575
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0575&pn=0822
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0575&pn=0856
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0575&pn=0930
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=9&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=199
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=250
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=206

Bill Comments

feedback