PA SB588 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in size, weight and load, further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for power of Governor during emergency.
Title
In size, weight and load, further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for power of Governor during emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 588 PN 646, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2019-05-07 | House | In the House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (32-15) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |