PA SB590 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in charter schools, establishing the Charter School Funding Advisory Commission.
Title
In charter schools, establishing the Charter School Funding Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 590 PN 705, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-06-24 | House | In the House |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |