PA SB593 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15986, on that portion of Interstate 79 northbound over West 16th Street in the City of Erie, Erie County, as the Thomas J. Kennedy, Jr., Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4011 over Pine Creek, Hegins Township, Schuylkill County, as the A. Donald Buffington Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15986, on that portion of Interstate 79 northbound over West 16th Street in the City of Erie, Erie County, as the Thomas J. Kennedy, Jr., Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4011 over Pine Creek, Hegins Township, Schuylkill County, as the A. Donald Buffington Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 593 PN 678, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-12 | House | In the House |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |