PA SB598 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in corporate net income, further providing for the definition of "taxable income."
Title
In corporate net income, further providing for the definition of "taxable income."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |