PA SB605 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - Act No. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - Act No. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of robbery.
Title
Further providing for the offense of robbery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - SB 605 PN 655, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - SB 605 PN 655, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - SB 605 PN 655, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Act No. 11 | |
2010-03-16 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-10 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-03-10 | Signed in House | |
2010-03-09 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-02-08 | Second consideration | |
2010-02-08 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-08-06 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-08-06 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-04 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-04 | First consideration | |
2009-08-04 | Reported as committed | |
2009-04-03 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2009-04-01 | In the House | |
2009-04-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-30 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-24 | First consideration | |
2009-03-24 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to JUDICIARY |