PA SB616 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in strategic development areas, further providing for sales and use tax and for local sales and use tax.
Title
In strategic development areas, further providing for sales and use tax and for local sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |