PA SB617 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the County of Mifflin certain lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at the State Fire Academy situate in the Borough of Lewistown, Mifflin County, together with appurtenant parking, for the benefit of the general public.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the County of Mifflin certain lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at the State Fire Academy situate in the Borough of Lewistown, Mifflin County, together with appurtenant parking, for the benefit of the general public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 617 PN 732, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-03 | House | In the House |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |