PA SB618 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in coal refuse energy and reclamation tax credit, further providing for definitions, for application and approval of tax credit and for limitation on tax credits.
Title
In coal refuse energy and reclamation tax credit, further providing for definitions, for application and approval of tax credit and for limitation on tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |