PA SB628 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for airport land development zones.
Title
Providing for airport land development zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |