PA SB633 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the declaration of a public health emergency, for duties of the Department of Health, for temporary regulations and for immunity from liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the declaration of a public health emergency, for duties of the Department of Health, for temporary regulations and for immunity from liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 633 PN 863, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseReferred to HEALTH
2019-06-12HouseIn the House
2019-06-12SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-11SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-04SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-04SenateReported as amended
2019-05-10SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=633
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0633&pn=0768
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0633&pn=0863
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=206
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=278
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=119

Bill Comments

feedback