PA SB658 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Center for Effective Indigent Defense Legal Representation and providing for duties and responsibilities of the board of directors.
Title
Establishing the Center for Effective Indigent Defense Legal Representation and providing for duties and responsibilities of the board of directors.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] | Sen. Arthur Haywood [D] | Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |