PA SB661 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, establishing the Agricultural Business Development Center, the Agricultural Business Development Center Advisory Committee and the Agricultural Business Development Center Fund; providing for the Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Program and establishing the Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Fund; providing for agriculture and youth development; establishing the Urban Agricultural Infrastructure Grant Program; and making a related repeal.
Title
Establishing the Agricultural Business Development Center, the Agricultural Business Development Center Advisory Committee and the Agricultural Business Development Center Fund; providing for the Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Program and establishing the Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Fund; providing for agriculture and youth development; establishing the Urban Agricultural Infrastructure Grant Program; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 661 PN 1075, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 661 PN 1075, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 661 PN 1036, 2019 A2411, CAUSER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A02243 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 661 PN 1001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 661 PN 1075, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 661 PN 1075, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 661 PN 1036, 2019 A2411, CAUSER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A02243 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 661 PN 1001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Act No. 40 |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Approved by the Acting Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2019-06-18 | House | In the House |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |