PA SB667 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-09 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 22 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-09 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 6, 1987 (P.L.381, No.79), known as the Older Adults Protective Services Act, further providing for legislative policy, for definitions, for involuntary intervention by emergency court order, for information relating to prospective facility personnel and for grounds for denying employment; providing for certificate of employability; further providing for provisional employees for limited periods; providing for requirements concerning employees, for comparison study by Department of Aging and for applicability relating to criminal history for employees.
Title
An Act amending the act of November 6, 1987 (P.L.381, No.79), known as the Older Adults Protective Services Act, further providing for legislative policy, for definitions, for involuntary intervention by emergency court order, for information relating to prospective facility personnel and for grounds for denying employment; providing for certificate of employability; further providing for provisional employees for limited periods; providing for requirements concerning employees, for comparison study by Department of Aging and for applicability relating to criminal history for employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-09 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-03 | First consideration | |
2008-06-03 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-22 | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=667 |