PA SB67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; providing for the form of the compact; imposing additional powers and duties on the Governor, the Secretary of the Commonwealth and the Compact.
Title
Authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; providing for the form of the compact; imposing additional powers and duties on the Governor, the Secretary of the Commonwealth and the Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: SB 67 PN 60, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 67 PN 60, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: SB 67 PN 60, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 67 PN 60, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Act No. 19 |
2020-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-06 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-04-29 | House | Signed in House |
2020-05-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-04-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-28 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-28 | House | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2019-11-18 | House | In the House |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |