PA SB675 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Referred to HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Referred to HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for certification of buprenorphine office-based prescribers; limiting the use of buprenorphine; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs.
Title
Providing for certification of buprenorphine office-based prescribers; limiting the use of buprenorphine; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Michele Brooks [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 675 PN 820, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-06-17 | House | In the House |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (41-9) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |