PA SB688 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers and duties of elected officials, further providing for organization of council, quorum, participation by telecommunication device, voting, compensation and eligibility; and, in mayor, further providing for salary of mayor.
Title
In powers and duties of elected officials, further providing for organization of council, quorum, participation by telecommunication device, voting, compensation and eligibility; and, in mayor, further providing for salary of mayor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |