PA SB694 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Act No. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Act No. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the act of July 20, 1979 (P.L.183, No.60), known as the Oil and Gas Lease Act, providing for cross unit drilling for unconventional wells.
Title
Amending the act of July 20, 1979 (P.L.183, No.60), known as the Oil and Gas Lease Act, providing for cross unit drilling for unconventional wells.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] |
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 694 PN 1284, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: SB 694 PN 1284, FP (Y: 197 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A03308 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 694 PN 1191, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 694 PN 1284, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: SB 694 PN 1284, FP (Y: 197 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A03308 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 694 PN 1191, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Senate | Act No. 85 |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-10-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-1) |
2019-10-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-28 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-28 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-28 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2019-09-25 | House | In the House |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |