PA SB695 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for medical assistance payments for institutional care and for nonemergency medical transportation services and providing for uniform Statewide preferred drug list; in nursing facility assessments, further providing for definitions, for calculation, for remedies, for repayment and for time periods; in intermediate care facilities for persons with an intellectual disability assessments, further providing for definitions and for time periods; and making a related repeal.
Title
In public assistance, further providing for medical assistance payments for institutional care and for nonemergency medical transportation services and providing for uniform Statewide preferred drug list; in nursing facility assessments, further providing for definitions, for calculation, for remedies, for repayment and for time periods; in intermediate care facilities for persons with an intellectual disability assessments, further providing for definitions and for time periods; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 695 PN 1084, FP (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 695 PN 1084, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 193 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02605 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 695 PN 1084, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02576 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02546 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02322 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 695 PN 833, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 695 PN 1084, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 193 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02605 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 695 PN 1084, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02576 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02546 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02322 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 695 PN 833, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 19 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-1) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-1) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-27 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2019-06-10 | House | In the House |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |