PA SB698 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for definitions, for physician assistants and for physician assistant license.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for physician assistants and for physician assistant license.
Sponsors
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Lawrence Farnese [D] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 698 PN 1026, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 698 PN 1026, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02043 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 698 PN 835, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 698 PN 1026, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 698 PN 1026, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02043 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 698 PN 835, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 68 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2019-06-12 | House | In the House |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |