PA SB699 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, further providing for physician assistants.
Title
Further providing for physician assistants.
Sponsors
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Lawrence Farnese [D] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 699 PN 1027, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 699 PN 1027, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02044 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 699 PN 836, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 699 PN 1027, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 699 PN 1027, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02044 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 699 PN 836, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 69 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2019-06-12 | House | In the House |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |